This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/24/2018 at 14:04:17 (UTC).

Pallida L.L.C. Successor in Interest of Pharia L.L.C.vs.Niccole Martin

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 Pallida L L C Successor in Interest of Pharia L L C filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Niccole Martin. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3958

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALLIDA L.L.C. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF PHARIA L.L.C.

Defendant

MARTIN, NICCOLE L.

Houston, TX 77084

Garnishee

First National Bank Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kinslow, Samuel T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2016
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Consent for Email Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Pallida L.L.C. Successor in Interest of Pharia L.L.C.; Parties Against: Martin, Niccole L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Pallida, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel T Kinslow