Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/03/2017 at 04:08:10 (UTC).

Pallida Llc Successor in Interest of Pharia Llcvs.Kathleen Dement

Case Summary

On 10/12/2015 Pallida Llc Successor in Interest of Pharia Llcvs Kathleen Dement was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8297

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALLIDA LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF PHARIA LLC

Defendant

DEMENT, KATHLEEN N

Humble, TX 77346

Garnishee

Jp Morgan Chase Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERBER, YONATAN Z

5555 West Loop South Suite 200

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant Attorney

Ghuneim, Wisam S

3115 Preston Rd Suite F

Pasadena, TX 77505

Other Attorneys

Spring Jr, Truman E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Notice-Filing of Plaintiff Aff and/or Oth Trial Rel Doc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Tue Apr 19 08:30:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Pallida Llc Successor in Interest of Pharia Llc; Parties Against: Dement, Kathleen N and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pallida, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spring, Truman E