This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/17/2023 at 03:04:19 (UTC).

Oxford Place vs. Rodney Bailey

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 Oxford Place filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rodney Bailey. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2977

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oxford Place

Defendant

Bailey, Rodney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulton, Kevin

Other Attorneys

Leach, Jennifer

Roberts, Mark E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Oxford Place

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketOrder Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Oxford Place; Parties Against: Bailey, Rodney; Post-Judgment Interest: 8.0000%; Judgment Amount: $3400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketConsent for Email Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Oxford Place

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less