This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/03/2022 at 05:01:48 (UTC).

OneMain Financial Group LLC vs. Sabrina T King

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 OneMain Financial Group LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sabrina T King. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3595

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OneMain Financial Group LLC

Defendant

King, Sabrina T

Houston, TX 77096

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackert, Dean

2601 Nw Expressway, Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketReferral to Online Case Resolution (OCR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: OneMain Financial Group LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackert, Dean