This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/08/2022 at 05:20:27 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs. Kara M Seales

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Onemain Financial Group, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kara M Seales. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9056

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, Llc

Defendant

Seales, Kara M

Spring, TX 77389

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackert, Dean

2601 Nw Expressway, Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketBankruptcy Filed Prior to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Onemain Financial Group, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackert, Dean