This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/27/2023 at 05:17:57 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs. Ashley M Zuno

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Onemain Financial Group, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ashley M Zuno. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6284

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, Llc

Defendant

Zuno, Ashley M

Cypress, TX 77433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackert, Dean

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant Attorney

Johnson, Jonathon Chadwick

701 N. Post Oak Road Suite 140

Houston, TX 77024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Onemain Financial Group, Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less