Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/27/2021 at 05:26:13 (UTC).

OneMain Financial Group LLC vs. Antonio Delcastillo

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 OneMain Financial Group LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Antonio Delcastillo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0967

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OneMain Financial Group LLC

Defendant

Delcastillo, Antonio

Pasadena, TX 77504-4047

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lansden, Tyler G

275 W. Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: OneMain Financial Group LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler G Lansden