This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/25/2023 at 04:14:22 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group Llc Successor By Merger To Springleaf Financial Services Of Texas Inc. vs. Maria A Keith

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Onemain Financial Group Llc Successor By Merger To Springleaf Financial Services Of Texas Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria A Keith. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5737

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group Llc Successor By Merger To Springleaf Financial Services Of Texas Inc.

Defendant

Keith, Maria A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackert, Dean

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Onemain Financial Group Llc Successor By Merger To Springleaf Financial Services Of Texas Inc.; Parties Against: Keith, Maria A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder-Agreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Onemain Financial Group Llc Successor By Merger To Springleaf Financial Services Of Texas Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less