Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/17/2018 at 12:54:58 (UTC).

Old West Capital Co As Assignee of the Judgment Originally Taken By Hudson & Keyse Llcvs.Philomina-Phina N Onwuachi A/K/A Blessing Onwuachi

Case Summary

On 11/16/2015 Old West Capital Co As Assignee of the Judgment Originally Taken By Hudson Keyse Llcvs Philomina-Phina N Onwuachi A/K/A Blessing Onwuachi was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8431

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLD WEST CAPITAL CO AS ASSIGNEE OF THE JUDGMENT ORIGINALLY TAKEN BY HUDSON & KEY

Old West Capital Co As Assignee of the Judgment Originally Taken By Hudson & Keyse Llc

Defendant

PHILOMINA-PHINA N ONWUACHI A/K/A BLESSING ONWUACHI

Humble, TX 77346-3147

Garnishee

Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHMAN, ALISA SCHER

304 S Record St Ste 100

Dallas, TX 75202

Other Attorneys

Spring Jr, Truman E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Old West Capital Co As Assignee of the Judgment Originally Taken By Hudson & Keyse Llc; Parties Against: Philomina-Phina N Onwuachi A/K/A Blessing Onwuachi and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Old West Capital Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spring, Truman E