This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 13:29:14 (UTC).

Nicollette Greenhouse, Yolanda Greenhouse vs. Meridith Dockall Johnson

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 Nicollette Greenhouse, Yolanda Greenhouse filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Meridith Dockall Johnson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5191

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greenhouse, Nicollette

Friendswood, TX 77546

Greenhouse, Yolanda

Friendswood, TX 77546

Defendant

Johnson, Meridith Dockall

Friendswood, TX 77546

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Pending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $25.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Greenhouse, Yolanda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Greenhouse, Yolanda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Dec 07 15:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Nov 02 15:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Greenhouse, Nicollette and others; Parties Against: Johnson, Meridith Dockall; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $343.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less