This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/18/2021 at 14:22:36 (UTC).

Neeraj Mahajan vs. Car Toys Inc

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Neeraj Mahajan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Car Toys Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0259

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mahajan, Neeraj

Defendant

Car Toys Inc

Not Classified By Court

Graham, C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/31/2021

HearingDescription: Judge Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021

HearingHearing: Judge Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2020

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2020

DocketAnswer Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2020

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2020

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $75.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Mahajan, Neeraj

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketSmall Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketAmended Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $124.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Mahajan, Neeraj

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less