This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/24/2022 at 13:00:32 (UTC).

Nautilus Insurance Company vs. STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, LLC AKA AND DBA STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, AND STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 Nautilus Insurance Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, LLC AKA AND DBA STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, AND STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7674

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nautilus Insurance Company

Defendant

STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, LLC AKA AND DBA STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, AND STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Totz, Jon D

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Nautilus Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELLA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, JON D