This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:05:02 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. Yoennis Arias

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Yoennis Arias. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8762

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

Arias, Yoennis

Houston, TX 77099

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, Katharine Banks

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingDescription: Default Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingHearing: Default Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less