Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/22/2018 at 13:51:03 (UTC).

Midland Funding Llc vs. Louis Gallien

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Midland Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Louis Gallien. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5209

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GALLIEN, LOUIS

Spring, TX 77379

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABRIELOVA, KRISTY

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2016
  • Linebarger Referral Collections Deliquent Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Midland Funding Llc; Parties Against: Gallien, Louis; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $2093.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less