Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:07:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. Diana Tovar

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Diana Tovar. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4439

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Tovar, Diana

Houston, TX 77087

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tahiliani, Manasi Tulpule

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingDescription: Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingHearing: Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Jun 04 13:30:00 CDT 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketBusiness Record Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less