Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 13:41:25 (UTC).

Midland Funding, Llc vs. Diana Madrigal

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Midland Funding, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Diana Madrigal. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6135

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

MADRIGAL, DIANA

Houston, TX 77076

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUYNH, SANDY

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Midland Funding, Llc; Parties Against: Madrigal, Diana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less