This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/26/2018 at 14:23:07 (UTC).

Midland Funding Llc vs. Derek Rudewig

Case Summary

On 02/12/2016 Midland Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Derek Rudewig. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2617

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

RUDEWIG, DEREK

Rudewig, Derek L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS, TIMOTHY

Po Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketPending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketPending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketNotice-Filing of Plaintiff Aff and/or Oth Trial Rel Doc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketHearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketHearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Midland Funding Llc; Parties Against: Rudewig, Derek L; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $2427.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wells, Timothy