This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/26/2018 at 06:10:05 (UTC).

Midland Funding Llc vs. Allen Ealy

Case Summary

On 07/17/2012 Midland Funding Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allen Ealy. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5427

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

EALY, ALLEN

Receiver

Adams, Michael J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKULIK, YVONNE

15851 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 245

Addison, TX 75001

Other Attorneys

Bowlin, Brandon Eugene

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketTurnover Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Midland Funding Llc; Parties Against: Ealy, Allen; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $4330.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon E. Bowlin