This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:07:36 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs. Valeria Velasquez

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Valeria Velasquez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8549

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Velasquez, Valeria

Humble, TX 77346

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, Peter S

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less