This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/25/2022 at 06:06:18 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs. Olga Avilez

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Olga Avilez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8088

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Avilez, Olga

Houston, TX 77034-5402

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caviness, David

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS