This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/21/2022 at 04:20:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. Kirsten S Ricketts aka Kirsten Ricketts

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kirsten S Ricketts aka Kirsten Ricketts. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4917

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

Kirsten S Ricketts aka Kirsten Ricketts

Pasadena, TX 77506

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goenaga, Juan Carlos

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketBusiness Record Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Goenaga