This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/25/2022 at 05:15:25 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs. Jeffery Holt

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeffery Holt. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9581

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendant

Holt, Jeffery

Houston, TX 77088-7021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caviness, David

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorney

Wiley, Kelvina E

4151 Southwest Fwy Ste 240

Houston, TX 77027

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMotion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Midland Credit Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketBusiness Record Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS