This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/27/2021 at 05:13:18 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs. Jackeline Guzman

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jackeline Guzman. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5666

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Guzman, Jackeline

Humble, TX 77346-1865

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caviness, David

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS