Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:08:45 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs. Elida Martinez

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elida Martinez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1535

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midland Credit Management Inc

Midland Funding Llc

Defendant

Martinez, Elida

Houston, TX 77047-3229

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tahiliani, Manasi Tulpule

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Midland Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less