Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:09:33 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. Blake Holmes

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Blake Holmes. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4442

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

Holmes, Blake

Houston, TX 77089

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, Peter S

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingHearing: Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketBusiness Record Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less