This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/05/2018 at 15:16:29 (UTC).

Michelle Lewis vs. Eduardo Ortiz individually and d/b/a Craftsmen Plumbers and Maintenance

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 Michelle Lewis filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Eduardo Ortiz individually and d/b/a Craftsmen Plumbers and Maintenance. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5023

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lewis, Michelle

Houston, TX 77029

Defendant

Eduardo Ortiz individually and d/b/a Craftsmen Plumbers and Maintenance

Pasadena, TX 77502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mayer, Eric J

1000 Louisiana St Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Defendant Attorney

Salinas, Alejandra C

1000 Louisiana Street Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Letter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Order-Granting Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2018
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Lewis, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $15.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Lewis, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $64.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Lewis, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Oct 04 09:00:00 CDT 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Aug 21 10:30:00 CDT 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: Lewis, Michelle; Parties Against: Eduardo Ortiz individually and d/b/a Craftsmen Plumbers and Maintenance; Post-Judgment Interest: 1.0000%; Judgment Amount: $10000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less