This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/11/2018 at 12:48:24 (UTC).

Mercedes Dominguez vs. All Occupants at 4734 Bell St

Case Summary

On 07/21/2014 Mercedes Dominguez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against All Occupants at 4734 Bell St. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0673

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINGUEZ, MERCEDES

Defendant

ALL OCCUPANTS AT 4734 BELL ST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Dominguez, Mercedes; Parties Against: All Occupants at 4734 Bell St

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less