Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 12:56:07 (UTC).

Maritza Miranda, Jorge Alvarado vs. Ramiro Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 Maritza Miranda, Jorge Alvarado filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ramiro Gonzalez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6363

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miranda, Maritza

Alvarado, Jorge

Defendant

Gonzalez, Ramiro

Houston, TX 77093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Flores, Yolanda Navarro

4801 Irvington Blvd

Houston, TX 77009

Flores, Yolanda

4801 Irvington Boulevard

Houston, TX 77009

Defendant Attorney

White, Brock A

405 Main Street Suite 602

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2017
  • Bond Refunded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Transcript Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Transcript of Judgment from Justice Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Eviction-Appeal Bond-Cash Deposit in Lieu of Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Bond Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Response Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Letter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $2400.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Cash Bond; Receipt Description: Cash Bond; Payor Name: Gonzalez, Ramiro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Gonzalez, Ramiro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Miranda, Maritza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Miranda, Maritza and others; Parties Against: Gonzalez, Ramiro; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $3200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less