This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 13:34:29 (UTC).

Manuel Constante vs. Keenan D Holmes dba Wholesale Home Direct

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 Manuel Constante filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Keenan D Holmes dba Wholesale Home Direct. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0880

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Constante, Manuel

Houston, TX 77087

Defendants

Wholesale Homes Direct

14819 Olde Manor Ln

Houston, TX 77068

Keenan D Holmes dba Wholesale Home Direct

Spring, TX 77379-3195

Not Classified By Court

Holmes, Keenan Diyon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Small Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Constante, Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $75.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Constante, Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Constante, Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Jan 10 10:00:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue May 01 10:00:00 CDT 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Hearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Mon Nov 20 10:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Hearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: Constante, Manuel; Parties Against: Keenan D Holmes dba Wholesale Home Direct and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $4100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less