This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:01:31 (UTC).

Madison Park Apts vs. Alan Lynn Sheurer

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Madison Park Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alan Lynn Sheurer. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8745

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Madison Park Apts

9801 Meadowglen Ln

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant

Sheurer, Alan Lynn

Houston, TX 77042

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Madison Park Apts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less