This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 14:01:47 (UTC).

Lynns Ac and Heating Company vs. Jamal Mehdawi

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 Lynns Ac and Heating Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jamal Mehdawi. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3117

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynns Ac and Heating Company

4918 Luella Ave

Deer Park, TX 77536

Defendant

Mehdawi, Jamal

Deer Park, TX 77536

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilson, William Larry

3515 Preston Avenue Suite 101

Pasadena, TX 77505

Wilson, Larry

3515 Preston Avenue Suite 101

Pasadena, TX 77505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Docket Control Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Designation of Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Lynns Ac and Heating Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $119.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Lynns Ac and Heating Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Feb 07 13:00:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Hearing: Pretrial Conference; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Nov 01 14:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Hearing: Pretrial Conference; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Nov 02 14:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Hearing: Pretrial Conference; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Sep 28 14:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: Lynns Ac and Heating Company; Parties Against: Mehdawi, Jamal; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $3800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less