Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 15:27:46 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llcvs.Ruben Montemayor, Jr.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 Lvnv Funding Llcvs Ruben Montemayor, Jr was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8558

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendants

MONTEMAYOR JR., RUBEN

Houston, TX 77060

Montemayor, Ruben, Jr.

Houston, TX 77060

Garnishee

C-E Federal Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HILLMAN, NICOLE

2437 Bay Area Blvd Suite 169

Houston, TX 77058

Hillman, Nicole Celeste

Po Box 2725

League City, TX 77574

Other Attorneys

Parker, H Brad

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Writ of Garnishment-Notice to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Lvnv Funding Llc; Parties Against: Montemayor, Ruben, Jr. and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Disposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C-E Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant