This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:31:31 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Rosa Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rosa Gonzalez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0909

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Gonzalez, Rosa

Cypress, TX 77429

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anshul, Alex

Po. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul