This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/16/2021 at 05:32:45 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Rakeisha Walker

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rakeisha Walker. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8503

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Walker, Rakeisha

Webster, TX 77598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephens, Thomas W

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: LVNV Funding LLC; Parties Against: Walker, Rakeisha; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $857.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketOrder-Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens