Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:07:59 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Mark D Holland

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mark D Holland. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3542

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Holland, Mark D

Spring, TX 77379

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas, Taylor

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David A

2190 N Loop W Ste 333

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less