This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/25/2022 at 18:52:43 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Lester Doze

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lester Doze. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9999

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Doze, Lester

Houston, TX 77064

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephens, Thomas W

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens