This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/17/2022 at 05:13:44 (UTC).

LVNV Funding, LLC vs. Keisha Franklin

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 LVNV Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Keisha Franklin. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8747

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding, LLC

Defendant

Franklin, Keisha

Houston, TX 77044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schwarcz, Pamela

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: LVNV Funding, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela Schwarcz