This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/23/2018 at 13:07:15 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee of Arrow Financial Services Llcvs.Aubrey Cannon

Case Summary

On 01/04/2016 Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee of Arrow Financial Services Llcvs Aubrey Cannon was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8551

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee of Arrow Financial Services Llc Assignee of Ge Money Bank

Defendant

CANNON, AUBREY L.

Garnishee

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hillman, Nicole Celeste

Po Box 2725

League City, TX 77574

Other Attorneys

Pearson, James Haralson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee of Arrow Financial Services Llc Assignee of Ge Money Bank; Parties Against: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and others

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARSON, JAMES HARALSON