Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/28/2017 at 01:58:57 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc As Assignee of A Judgment Rendered in Sherman Acquisition 11 Lpvs.Erica Henderson

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 Lvnv Funding Llc As Assignee of A Judgment Rendered in Sherman Acquisition 11 Lpvs Erica Henderson was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6482

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF A JUDGMENT RENDERED IN SHERMAN ACQUISITION 11 L

Lvnv Funding Llc As Assignee of A Judgment Rendered in Sherman Acquisition 11 Lp

Lvnv Funding Llc As Assignee of A Judgment Rendered in Sherman Acquisition Limited Partnership

Defendant

HENDERSON, ERICA

Houston, TX 77095

Garnishee

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT, MICHAEL JOSEPH

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75006

Scott, Michael J

3236 Towerwood Dr

Dallas, TX 75234

Other Attorneys

Pearson, James Haralson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2016
  • Dismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Lvnv Funding Llc As Assignee of A Judgment Rendered in Sherman Acquisition Limited Partnership; Parties Against: Henderson, Erica and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARSON, JAMES HARALSON