This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/02/2018 03:03:38

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Limestone Apartments Lp Dba Limestone against Patrick Swoboda Nadine Mohr in the jurisdiction of Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXX3128
  • Filing Date 10/04/2017
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Property - Residential Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Harris County Justice Courts
  • Courthouse Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1
  • County Harris
  • State Texas

Party Details

  • Defendant Swoboda, Patrick
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Limestone Apartments Lp Dba Limestone
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Mohr, Nadine
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • Order-Dismiss
  • 10/18/2017
  • Service Return
  • 10/12/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service
  • 10/12/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service
  • 10/04/2017
  • Original Petition Filed
  • 10/04/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent
  • 10/04/2017
  • Eviction Citation
  • 10/06/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $196.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Limestone Apartments LP dba Limestone
  • 10/25/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Wed Oct 25 08:00:00 CDT 2017
  • 10/25/2017
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.