Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/21/2018 at 12:32:08 (UTC).

Leonid Kostitsyn vs. Prasenjit Peter Ghosh, Reba Ghosh, Prabir Kumar Ghosh

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Leonid Kostitsyn filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Prasenjit Peter Ghosh, Reba Ghosh, Prabir Kumar Ghosh. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1195

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOSTITSYN, LEONID

Houston, TX 77063

Defendants

GHOSH, PRASENJIT PETER

Houston, TX 77083

GHOSH, REBA

Houston, TX 77083

Ghosh, Prabir Kumar

Houston, TX 77083

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2015
  • Eviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Eviction-Citation Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Kostitsyn, Leonid; Parties Against: Ghosh, Prasenjit Peter and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less