This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/22/2017 at 23:40:10 (UTC).

Lead-Based Paint Services Llc Dba Integrity Lead-Based Paint Services vs. Ad Construction and Development Inc

Case Summary

On 02/29/2016 Lead-Based Paint Services Llc Dba Integrity Lead-Based Paint Services filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ad Construction and Development Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9258

  • Filing Date:

    02/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEAD-BASED PAINT SERVICES LLC DBA INTEGRITY LEAD-BASED PAINT SERVICES

Defendant

AD CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Crowder, Daniel Farris

2211 Norfolk Suite 610

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Fay, Daniel Joseph

6588 Corporate Drive Suite 200

Houston, TX 77036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketDismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Lead-Based Paint Services Llc Dba Integrity Lead-Based Paint Services; Parties Against: Ad Construction and Development Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROWDER, DANIEL FARRIS