Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/03/2021 at 03:12:43 (UTC).

Lawrence Joseph Aertker Jr/Sarah Kainer Aertker vs. Xpress Floors dba My Flooring America

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Lawrence Joseph Aertker Jr/Sarah Kainer Aertker filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Xpress Floors dba My Flooring America. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5205

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Joseph Aertker Jr/Sarah Kainer Aertker

Defendants

Xpress Floors dba My Flooring American

Xpress Floors dba My Flooriing America

Xpress Floors dba My Flooring America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Simmons, Richard A

15150 Middlebrook Drive

Houston, TX 77058

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $124.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Lawrence Joseph Aertker Jr/Sarah Kainer Aertker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simmons, Richard A