This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 13:29:24 (UTC).

Lanza Law Firm Pc vs. Charles Olson

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 Lanza Law Firm Pc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Charles Olson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0512

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanza Law Firm Pc

4950 Bissonnet St

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant

Olson, Charles

Missouri City, TX 77459

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lanza, Nicholas J

4950 Bissonnet

Bellaire, TX 77401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • Writ of Execution-Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Other Documents Not Listed - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Lanza Law Firm Pc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Lanza Law Firm Pc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Judgment: Parties For: Lanza Law Firm Pc; Parties Against: Olson, Charles; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $4632.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less