This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/23/2023 at 05:04:17 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC vs. Senequa Anquan Wilson, NATHAN GEORGE SMITH AND/OR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Senequa Anquan Wilson, NATHAN GEORGE SMITH AND/OR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0188

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

Wilson, Senequa Anquan

Houston, TX 77061

NATHAN GEORGE SMITH AND/OR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bartee, Nicole M

400 N Sam Houston Pkwy E, Suite 900A

Houston, TX 77060

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketWrit Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC; Parties Against: Wilson, Senequa Anquan and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.5000%; Judgment Amount: $0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $183.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less