Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/27/2021 at 05:01:42 (UTC).

La Casita Apartments vs. Marissa D. Palacious, Walter A. Zelaya

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 La Casita Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Marissa D Palacious, Walter A Zelaya. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9746

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

La Casita Apartment

313 Sunnyside

Houston, TX 77076

La Casita Apartments

313 Sunnyside

Houston, TX 77076

Defendants

Palacious, Marissa D.

Houston, TX 77076

Zelaya, Walter A.

Houston, TX 77076

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu May 27 13:45:00 CDT 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $196.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: La Casita Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where La Casita Apartments is a litigant