This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/07/2020 at 03:20:49 (UTC).

Kristin Gutierrez vs. Gary Barber Persistent Services LLC Geeks of Houston

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Kristin Gutierrez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gary Barber Persistent Services LLC Geeks of Houston. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6508

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gutierrez, Kristin

Houston, TX 77082

Defendant

Gary Barber Persistent Services LLC Geeks of Houston

1402 Glourie Dr

Houston, TX 77055

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $124.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Gutierrez, Kristin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less