This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/15/2022 at 16:01:13 (UTC).

Kiera Katherine Thomas vs. Equifax

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Kiera Katherine Thomas filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Equifax. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6107

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas, Kiera Katherine

Humble, TX 77346

Defendant

Equifax

1550 Peachtree Street Nw, Mail Drop H-42

Atlanta, GA 30309

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $38.96; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Thomas, Kiera Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $54.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Thomas, Kiera Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPending Jury Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketJury Fee Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant