Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/09/2018 at 07:49:18 (UTC).

Juniper Gulf Freeway Ltd dba Del Mar vs. LaPorsche Wallace

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 Juniper Gulf Freeway Ltd dba Del Mar filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LaPorsche Wallace. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3119

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juniper Gulf Freeway Ltd dba Del Mar

10909 Gulf Freeway

Houston, TX 77034

Defendant

Wallace, LaPorsche

Houston, TX 77034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2017
  • Order-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Motion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Juniper Gulf Freeway Ltd dba Del Mar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Feb 09 14:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less