This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/18/2022 at 23:25:48 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs. Melissa Razo

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Melissa Razo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7948

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

Razo, Melissa

Houston, TX 77056-4803

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O.Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $1.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Moss, Michael A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Certified Copy Requested Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Oct 06 09:00:00 CDT 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.; Parties Against: Razo, Melissa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketBusiness Record Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss